MK Management Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: MK Management Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, The Hartford, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Sentinel Insurance Company Limited, Sima Shahinpar and Sima Shahinpar individually doing business as First Affinity Insurance Solutions
Case Number: 8:2019cv01567
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference is set for 12/9/2019 at 08:30 a.m. (rrp)
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #28 as to defendants Sentinel Insurance Company Limited, Sima Shahinpar. (twdb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc.. Notice of Omitted Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mokri, Brad)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #28 filed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc.. (Mokri, Brad)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc.(Mokri, Brad)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Text Only Order STRIKING Minute Entry 25 by Judge David O. Carter: Minute Entry entered in the wrong case number. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order #22 . (kh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, if desired, on or before 10/4/2019. Scheduling Conference to be rescheduled. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Brad A. Mokri; Defendant Attorney: Michael L. Parker; Time in Court: :04. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 [STRICKEN SEE DKT. #26] MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Order to be issued. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Nicole Marie McLaughlin; Defendant Attorney: Darin R. Dominguez, Joshua Roy Engle, Mitchell Greenberg; Time in Court: :07. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) Modified on 9/24/2019 (dgo).
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #12 . Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, if so desired, by October 4, 2019. (twdb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 9/23/2019 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. **The Scheduling Conference remains on calendar** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc.. (Mokri, Brad)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Parker, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss)(Parker, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12B(6) OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc.. (Mokri, Brad)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Parker, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/23/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice) (Parker, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by PLAINTIFF MK Management Inc... (Mokri, Brad)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Parker, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Notice of Assignment to United States Judges and Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter served on August 16, 2019. (Parker, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Brad A. Mokri re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #7 Response to Order to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Lack of Procsecution filed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc.. (Mokri, Brad)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2019. (twdb)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff MK Management Inc., upon Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 7/18/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 207) (esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff MK Management Inc. (Filed as document 1, attachment 2, p. 6) (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Parker, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Parker, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01083278-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24259885 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Parker, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Michael L. Parker added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Parker, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MK Management Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Edward Feeley
Represented By: Michael L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: John Edward Feeley
Represented By: Michael L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sima Shahinpar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sima Shahinpar individually doing business as First Affinity Insurance Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MK Management Inc.
Represented By: Brad A Mokri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?