Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. v. Joyfun Inc Co., Limited et al
Plaintiff: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: WANG HAO a/k/a HOWELL WANG, DOE 2 a/k/a SIMDEV, ZROAD (HONGKONG) CO., LIMITED d/b/a INSTANTFUNS, SHANGHAI YINFAN NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., DOE 1 a/k/a simosimo2018ab@gmail.com, JOYFUN INC CO., LIMITED a/k/a SINA GAMES OVERSEAS (),, SHANGHAI ZHOUZHONG NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., INTELLIGENT JOYFUL INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, ZROAD, INC., LUTONG ZHOU a/k/a CARLY ZHOU, Wang Hao, DOE 1, DOE 2, Joyfun Inc Co., Limited, Lutong Zhou, simosimo, Sina Games Overseas, DOES 3 through 10, inclusive, Carly Zhou, Howell Wang, Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited and Simdev
Case Number: 8:2019cv01582
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2019 filed by Defendant Zroad, Inc..(Dabdoub, Pamela)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited.(Dabdoub, Pamela)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Pamela Dabdoub on behalf of Defendants Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited, Zroad, Inc. (Attorney Pamela Dabdoub added to party Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela Dabdoub added to party Zroad, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dabdoub, Pamela)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE LIMITED IMMEDIATE DISCOVERY #19 by Judge James V. Selna. It is hereby ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's Application is hereby GRANTED in its entirety; 2. Plaintiff is hereby granted leave to serve the subpoenas that are attached to the declaration in support of the Application. (es)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 EX PARTE APPLICATION to to Take Limited Immediate Discovery filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc E. Mayer in Support of Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Immediate Discovery, #2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Immediate Discovery) (Mayer, Marc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AS TO DEFENDANT JOYFUN INC CO., LIMITED #16 by Judge James V. Selna. IT ISHEREBY ORDERED that Joyfun shall respond to the Complaint on or by October 31, 2019. (lom)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Joyfun Inc Co., Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rutowski, Diana)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Diana M Rutowski on behalf of Defendant Joyfun Inc Co., Limited (Attorney Diana M Rutowski added to party Joyfun Inc Co., Limited (pty:dft))(Rutowski, Diana)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Joyfun Inc Co., Limited served on 8/25/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JoyFun Inc Co., Limited aka Sina Games Overseas () in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayer, Marc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Zroad, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zroad, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayer, Marc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Intelligent Joyful International Limited served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Intelligent Joyful International Limited in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayer, Marc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., upon Defendant Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited served on 8/25/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zroad (HongKong) Co. Limited dba Instantfuns in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mayer, Marc)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/04/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 10/28/2019. (lb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants DOE 1, DOE 2, Wang Hao, Intelligent Joyful International Limited, Joyfun Inc Co., Limited, Shanghai Yinfan Network Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Zhouzhong Network Technology Co., Ltd., Lutong Zhou and Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited, Zroad, Inc. (jtil)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., identifying Activision Blizzard, Inc., a publicly traded company, is the ultimate parent of Plaintiff. (Mayer, Marc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Mayer, Marc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24278640 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Attorney Marc Ellis Mayer added to party Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mayer, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. v. Joyfun Inc Co., Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANG HAO a/k/a HOWELL WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 2 a/k/a SIMDEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZROAD (HONGKONG) CO., LIMITED d/b/a INSTANTFUNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANGHAI YINFAN NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1 a/k/a simosimo2018ab@gmail.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYFUN INC CO., LIMITED a/k/a SINA GAMES OVERSEAS (),
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANGHAI ZHOUZHONG NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTELLIGENT JOYFUL INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZROAD, INC.
Represented By: David Charles Buxbaum
Represented By: Pamela Dabdoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUTONG ZHOU a/k/a CARLY ZHOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang Hao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyfun Inc Co., Limited
Represented By: Diana M Rutowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutong Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: simosimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sina Games Overseas
Represented By: Diana M Rutowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 3 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carly Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howell Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zroad Hongkong Co. Limited
Represented By: David Charles Buxbaum
Represented By: Pamela Dabdoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simdev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Represented By: Mark Crawford Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?