Vina Holdings, Inc. v. Hung Chris Huynh
Plaintiff: Vina Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Hung Chris Huynh
Petitioner: Vina Holdings, Inc. dba 24/7 Care at Home Home-Health
Case Number: 8:2019cv01585
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Counsel is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than 10/17/2019, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to FRCP Rule 41, for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3, filed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc... (Bell, James)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3, filed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc... (Bell, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc., upon Defendant Hung Chris Huynh served on 9/2/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Bell, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Hung Chris Huynh. (jp)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc.. (Bell, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc.. (Bell, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc. dba 24/7 Care at Home Home-Health, identifying Cuong Larry Nguyen. (Bell, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24279135 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vina Holdings, Inc. dba 24/7 Care at Home Home-Health. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney James Samuel Bell added to party Vina Holdings, Inc. dba 24/7 Care at Home Home-Health (pty:bkmov))(Bell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vina Holdings, Inc. v. Hung Chris Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Chris Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vina Holdings, Inc. dba 24/7 Care at Home Home-Health
Represented By: James Samuel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vina Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James Samuel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?