Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. BK-Motorsport Inc.
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Defendant: BK-Motorsport Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01627
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Preliminary Injunction without Prejudice and Stipulation re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference #19 . Defendant shall have up to 11/15/19 to respond to Complaint. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction noticed for 10/21/19 is taken off calendar; Scheduling Conference continued to 11/4/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Preliminary Injunction as to BK-Motorsport Inc. filed by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Philip)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., upon Defendant BK-Motorsport Inc. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Person in Charge in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Philip)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Correct [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark . Motion #14 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Philip)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark . Motion filed by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Philip)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Gregory D. Phillips APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Plaintiff, designating Philip E. Smith as local counsel. (twdb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory D. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24340106) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory D. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24340106) filed by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Philip)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory D. Phillips. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant BK-Motorsport Inc. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Smith, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Smith, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Smith, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Smith, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24316271 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Philip Edward Smith added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:pla))(Smith, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. BK-Motorsport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Edward Smith
Represented By: Michael W Ellison
Represented By: Gregory D Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BK-Motorsport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?