Austin Holden v. Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Austin Holden
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01632
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Jury Trial August 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference July 27, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off April 27, 2020. Law and Motion Cut-off June 22, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than June 29, 2020. (See document for further details.) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Derrick Y Chu counsel for Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Adding Derrick Y. Chu as counsel of record for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Derrick Y Chu added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Chu, Derrick)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PRESUMPTIVE SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL DATES)(Chu, Derrick)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 10/07/2019 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/30/2019. (lb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Giselle K. Valles re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #9 filed by Plaintiff Austin Holden. (Valles, Giselle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Austin Holden, identifying Mercedes-Benz, USA, LLC. (Attorney Giselle K Valles added to party Austin Holden(pty:pla))(Valles, Giselle)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA, LLC in Orange County Superior Court on 8/16/2019, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Austin Holden in Orange County Superior Court on 7/22/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Jury Demand #3 served on 8/23/2019. (Greco, Anthony)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler North America Corporation. (Greco, Anthony)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Greco, Anthony)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Greco, Anthony)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01085098-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24320975 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Answer of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Contract upon which plaintiff's State Court Complaint is based) (Attorney Anthony Paul Greco added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:mov))(Greco, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Holden v. Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Holden
Represented By: John D Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Matthew E Neale
Represented By: Aaron David Fhima
Represented By: Giselle K Valles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Paul Greco
Represented By: Benson Yeager Douglas
Represented By: Derrick Y Chu
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?