Anthony Longobardo v. AVCO Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Longobardo
Defendant: AVCO Corporation, Lycoming Engines, Consolidated Fuel Systems, Inc., Kelly Aerospace, Inc., Trimmer Aviation, LLC and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01720
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #8 Relay in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longobardo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Aghavni V. Kasparian in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Remand)(Kasparian, Aghavni)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney M Christopher Hall counsel for Defendant AVCO Corporation. Changing firm name to Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani. Changing email to chall@grsm.com. Filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation. (Hall, M)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Manuel Saldana counsel for Defendant AVCO Corporation. Changing firm name to Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP. Changing email to chall@grsm.com. Filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation. (Saldana, Manuel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #8 filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Manuel Saldana, #2 Exhibit A through D in Support of Saldana Declaration)(Saldana, Manuel)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Avco/Lycoming Engines #12 . Motion hearing continued to 1/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 First STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation-Lycoming Engines from November 18, 2019 to January 27, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longobardo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation/Lycoming Engines)(Kasparian, Aghavni)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (rrp)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendant AVCO Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian K. Hudson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian K. Hudson, #3 Declaration of M. Christopher Hall, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of M. Christopher Hall, #5 Proposed Order) (Saldana, Manuel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff, Anthony Longobardo Anthony Longobardo, identifying Plaintiff; Defendant Avco Corporation; Defendant Lycoming Engines; Defendant Kelly Aerospace, Inc.; Defendant Consolidated Fuel Systems, Inc.; Defendant Trimmer Aviation, LLC; Jan ("J.J") Wessels; Natalie Richardson Wessels; Recreation Aviation Foundation; and Richard Lach. (Kasparian, Aghavni)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Anthony Longobardo Anthony Longobardo. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aghavni V. Kasparian in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order granting motion to remand) (Kasparian, Aghavni)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 7.1 filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation (Saldana, Manuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
September 9, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AVCO Corporation, Consolidated Fuel Systems, Inc., Does 1-100, Kelly Aerospace, Inc., Lycoming Engines, Trimmer Aviation, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longobardo. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation, identifying Anthony Longobardo, Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines, Kelly Aerospace, Inc., Consolidated Fuel Systems, Inc., Trimmer Aviation, LLC, Recreation Aviation Foundation, Richard Lach. (Saldana, Manuel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation. (Saldana, Manuel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01063700-CU Receipt No: 0973-24405017 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant AVCO Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - I, #3 Declaration of Brian K. Hudson, #4 Declaration of Manuel Saldana) (Attorney Manuel Saldana added to party AVCO Corporation(pty:dft))(Saldana, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Longobardo v. AVCO Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Represented By: Manuel Saldana
Represented By: M Christopher Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Engines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Fuel Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimmer Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Longobardo
Represented By: Aghavni V Kasparian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?