G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Martin Olivares et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Arturo Cardoso Rivera and Martin Ocampo Olivares
Case Number: 8:2019cv01730
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Martin Ocampo Olivares, and Arturo Cardoso Rivera, individually and d/b/a El Rincon Mexicano (shb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default All Defendants G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Riley, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, upon Defendant Arturo Cardoso Rivera served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, upon Defendant Martin Ocampo Olivares served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Arturo Cardoso Rivera. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Martin Ocampo Olivares. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Related Group Control Number is CV 10-128-WDK(JCx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Riley, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24419080 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Martin Olivares et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Cardoso Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Ocampo Olivares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?