United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Solare Apartments SA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members and Anna Marie Wiggins
Defendant: SOLARE APARTMENTS SA, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01767
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2019. (twdb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Solare Apartments SA, LLC identifying Solare as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McMahon, Craig)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Solare Apartments SA, LLC answer now due 11/8/2019, filed by defendant Solare Apartments SA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Craig D McMahon added to party Solare Apartments SA, LLC(pty:dft))(McMahon, Craig)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Solare Apartments SA, LLC. (ghap)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins, identifying SOLARE APARTMENTS SA, LLC. (Wakefield, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Wakefield, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24447892 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Anna Marie Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Complaint, #2 Exhibit B To Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Anna Marie Wiggins(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Solare Apartments SA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Wiggins
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLARE APARTMENTS SA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?