First Midwest Equipment Finance Co. v. Richard Rudder et al
Plaintiff: First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.
Defendant: Richard Rudder and Benito Rudder
Case Number: 8:2019cv01802
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Virginia A. Phillips is assigned to this new case number 8:19-cv-01802-VAP. All future documents must be filed under this new case number. The previous case number, 8:19-mc-00009-UA, is hereby terminated. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Order for For Service of Process by Registered Process Server filed by Plaintiff First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.. (Cronin, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Writ of Execution issued against Benito Rudder, Richard Rudder re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #7 . (bm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiff First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution)(Cronin, Brian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff First Midwest Equipment Finance Co. and against Benito Rudder and Richard Rudder in the amount of $191,535.06 for principal and $5,833.34 for attorney fees. (lwag)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian David Cronin on behalf of Plaintiff First Midwest Equipment Finance Co. (Attorney Brian David Cronin added to party First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.(pty:pla))(Cronin, Brian)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Judgment filed by Plaintiff First Midwest Equipment Finance Co. re: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451), #2 (Dawe, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451), #2 . The following error(s) was found: A certified copy of the judgment from the district in which judgment was entered is missing. Counsel must file a certified copy of the judgment from that district to meet the requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1963. (lh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT with filing fee previously paid ($47.00 paid on 03/12/2019, receipt number 097323357938), filed by Plaintiff First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.. (Attachments: #1 JUDGMENT) (Attorney Michael George Dawe added to party First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.(pty:pla))(Dawe, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Midwest Equipment Finance Co. v. Richard Rudder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benito Rudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Midwest Equipment Finance Co.
Represented By: Brian David Cronin
Represented By: Michael George Dawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?