Pinn, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Pinn, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01805
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #32 by Judge David O. Carter. The deadline for Apple to answer Pinns live Complaint shall be extended up to and including December 18, 2019, or the date that is 28 days after Pinn files an amended complaint, whichever is later. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
November 12, 2019 Filing 32 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 18, 2019, or the date that is 28 days after Pinn files an amended complaint, whichever is later re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marchese, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of address by Christopher S Marchese attorney for Defendant Apple Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 633 West Fifth Street, 26th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Meghana C RaoRane on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attorney Meghana C RaoRane added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft))(RaoRane, Meghana)
October 15, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher S Marchese counsel for Defendant Apple Inc.. Adding Christopher S. Marchese as counsel of record for Apple, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher S Marchese added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft))(Marchese, Christopher)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Seth M Sproul counsel for Defendant Apple Inc.. Adding Seth M. Sproul as counsel of record for Apple, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attorney Seth M Sproul added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft))(Sproul, Seth)
October 15, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple Inc. answer now due 11/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc..(Hatch, Ryan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc., upon Defendant Apple Inc. served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Hatch, Ryan)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Enrique Sanchez Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pinn Inc, Plaintiff, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (twdb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney David A. Skeels APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pinn Inc, Plaintiff, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (twdb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S. Kudlac APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pinn Inc, Plaintiff, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (twdb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Cabrach J. Connor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pinn Inc, Plaintiff, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (twdb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Tatum Lee APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pinn Inc, Plaintiff, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (twdb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Enrique Sanchez Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pinn, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24491882) filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David A. Skeels to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pinn, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24491690) filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S. Kudlac to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pinn, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24490927) filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cabrach J. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pinn, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24490751) filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pinn, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24490615) filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S Kudlac. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Enrique Sanchez, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David A Skeels. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cabrach J Connor. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple Inc. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc., (Hatch, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Pinn, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24477259 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pinn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Ryan E Hatch added to party Pinn, Inc. (pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinn, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Marchese
Represented By: Meghana C RaoRane
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinn, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan E Hatch
Represented By: Cabrach J Connor
Represented By: Enrique Sanchez, Jr
Represented By: Kevin S Kudlac
Represented By: David A Skeels
Represented By: Jennifer A Tatum Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?