Nagui Mankaruse v. Intel Corporation
Plaintiff: Nagui Mankaruse
Defendant: Matthew Robert Hulse, Daniel Patrick Docter, Acer America Corporation, DOES 1-10, inclusive, Intel Corporation, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and Andy D. Bryant
Case Number: 8:2019cv01902
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #18 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against plaintiff Acer America Corporation, Andy D. Bryant, DOES, Daniel Patrick Docter, Matthew Robert Hulse, Intel Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse(twdb)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Acer America Corporation, Andy D. Bryant, Daniel Patrick Docter, Matthew Robert Hulse, Intel Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Gratzinger, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Peter E Gratzinger added to party Acer America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Peter E Gratzinger added to party Andy D. Bryant(pty:dft), Attorney Peter E Gratzinger added to party Daniel Patrick Docter (pty:dft), Attorney Peter E Gratzinger added to party Matthew Robert Hulse(pty:dft), Attorney Peter E Gratzinger added to party Intel Corporation(pty:dft)) (Gratzinger, Peter)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse, upon Defendant Intel Corporation mailed on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse, upon Defendant Acer America Corporation mailed on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse, upon Defendant Daniel Patrick Docter mailed on on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel Patrick Docter in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse, upon Defendant Matthew Robert Hulse mailed on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Matthew Robert Hulse in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse, upon Defendant Andy D. Bryant mailed on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andy D. Bryant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb) Modified on 10/18/2019 (twdb).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 Matthew Robert Hulse C/O defendant Intel Corporation. (twdb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Andy D. Bryant, C/O Defendant, Intel Corporation. (twdb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendant Acer America Corporation. (twdb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendant Daniel Patrick Docter. (twdb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendant Intel Corporation. (twdb)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (twdb)
October 9, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(mba)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse. (jtil)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse. (jtil)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nagui Mankaruse against Defendants Acer America Corporation, Daniel Patrick Docter, Matthew Robert Hulse, Intel Corporation.Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagui Mankaruse v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Robert Hulse
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Patrick Docter
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy D. Bryant
Represented By: Peter E Gratzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagui Mankaruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?