Matthew Gregory Szymanski v. Electronic Arts Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Gregory Szymanski
Defendant: State of California and Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01973
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, DENYING #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (es)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST to Judge to be heard and appear in writing for case, filed by plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (ghap) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/25/2019) (ghap).
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for entry of evidence; request for magistrate trial; Notice Request for attorney, filed by plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Matthew Gregory Szymanski (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT 1 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Defendants Electronic Arts Inc., State of California. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott., filed by plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons) (ghap)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have not submitted the entire filing fee amount of $400. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you may request that the fee be waived. To do so, you must complete, sign, and return the enclose form, Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), in its entirety. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Lodged Complaint, #2 CV-71, #3 CV-60, #4 CV-30, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Letter, #7 Request for entry of evidence; request for magistrate trial; Note Request for attorney, #8 Request to Judge to be heard and appears inwriting for case, #9 Summons) (ghap).
October 17, 2019 LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Matthew Gregory Szymanski. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Gregory Szymanski v. Electronic Arts Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gregory Szymanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?