United African Asian Abilities Club et al v. McFadden Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV and United African Asian Abilities Club
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, MCFADDEN ASSOCIATES LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02015
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African Asian Abilities Club. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Wakefield, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to McFadden Associates LLC answer now due 12/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant McFadden Associates LLC.(Attorney Robert H Panman added to party McFadden Associates LLC(pty:dft))(Panman, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 12/30/2019. (lb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant McFadden Associates LLC. (car)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying MCFADDEN ASSOCIATES LLC. (Wakefield, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24651883 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Complaint, #2 Exhibit B To Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United African Asian Abilities Club et al v. McFadden Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCFADDEN ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: Robert H Panman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie James Davis IV
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African Asian Abilities Club
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?