Christian Velazquez v. Panda Motors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christian Velazquez
Defendant: Panda Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02031
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PANDA MOTORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS [L.R. 8-3], #11 by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant shall have up to and including January 8, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. (es)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Panda Motors, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020, filed by Defendant Panda Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James Steven Sifers added to party Panda Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sifers, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez, upon Defendant Panda Motors, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Duane Aleman, Registered Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thompson, Russell)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/21/2020. (lb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Panda Motors, Inc. (et)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez, (Thompson, Russell)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Thompson, Russell)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Thompson, Russell)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24663148 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC) (Attorney Russell S Thompson, IV added to party Christian Velazquez(pty:pla))(Thompson, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian Velazquez v. Panda Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Velazquez
Represented By: Russell S Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?