Stephen Ko v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Ko
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Dorian Bradley, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Doe and DOES 4 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02081
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING SANCTIONS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING SANCTIONS by Judge Andrew J. Guildford: The Court has repeatedly expressed its serious concerns about these cases and the many others filed by Mr. Doo Ko that preceded them, with all concerning basically the same dispute. To address these concerns, the Court has held multiple hearings. Defendants dutifully appeared at each of these hearings, prepared to answer the Court's questions. But Mr. Chang Woo and Mr. Doo Ko have consistently failed to appear, forcing the Court to dismiss their cases and award monetary sanctions to compensate Defendants for their time. Then, when cases concerning the subject property continued to be filed, the Court set another hearing, this time ordering all three Plaintiffs to appear. Only Mr. Stephen Ko showed up and answered questions under oath. Mr. Chang Woo and Mr. Doo Ko ignored the Court's order to appear, and further sanctions against them are necessary. The Court thus ORDERS Mr. Chang Woo and Mr. Doo Ko to jointly and severally pay an additional $5,000 to Defendants. If Mr. Chang Woo and Mr. Doo Ko continue to disobey Court orders by failing to pay these monetary sanctions, the Court will be forced to impose non-monetary sanctions. (See document for further details.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice; Declaration filed by plaintiff Stephen Ko(es)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (EVIDENTIARY) Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Prose plaintiffs Chang Woo and Doo Ko are not present. For the reasons stated on the record, all matters concerning, but not limited to, previously ordered sanctions, attorneys' fees, possible imprisonment of plaintiffs, dismissal of actions with prejudice are taken under submission. The Court shall issue a further order on Friday, November 15, 2019 Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #12 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Koto #12 (es)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOE 3 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Ko. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (es)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOE 2 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Ko. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (es)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOE 1 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Ko. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (es)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has numerous concerns about this case, principally as it relates to other cases that have been filed in this Court. The Court thus SETS a scheduling conference for Tuesday, November 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. At this hearing, the Court also ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions are not appropriate and why this action isn't barred by the following related cases, which the Court dismissed with prejudice on October 25, 2019- four days before this case was filed. (See document for further details.) (es)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-01846 AG (DFMx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02081 AG (DFMx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (esa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #9 served on November 6, 2019. (Feng, Simon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Feng, Simon)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on November 4, 2019. (McClendon, Regina)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
October 31, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Stephen Ko in Orange County Superior Court on 10/29/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, re Notice of Related Case(s), #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 served on October 31, 2019. (McClendon, Regina)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-01846-AG-DFM; 8:19-cv-01268-AG-DFM; 8:19-cv-01754-AG-DFM; 8:19-cv-01963-AG-DFM (McClendon, Regina)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, identifying LSF6 Service Operations, LLC; LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC; U.S. Bancorp. (McClendon, Regina)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (McClendon, Regina)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01108142 Receipt No: 0973-24706941 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Attorney Regina J McClendon added to party Caliber Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Regina J McClendon added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust(pty:dft))(McClendon, Regina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Ko v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Represented By: Simon M Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorian Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Represented By: Simon M Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 4 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?