Inland Detox, Inc. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: INLAND DETOX, INC., and Inland Detox, Inc.
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, OPTUM, INC.,, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, VIANT, INC.,, MULTIPLAN, INC.,, UHC of California, Optum, Inc., Viant, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Multiplan, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, Does 1 through 25, inclusive and United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02087
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #7 #12 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant(s) UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; OptumInsight, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; and Optum, Inc., designating Divya S. Gupta as local counsel. (es)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND EXTENSION OF DEFENDANTS VIANT, INC. AND MULTIPLAN, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30DAYS (L.R. 8-3), #23 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants Viant, Inc. and MultiPlan, Inc. shall have up to and including December 31, 2019, by which to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (es)
December 5, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 31, 2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Inland Detox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Adrian L Canzoneri added to party Inland Detox, Inc.(pty:pla))(Canzoneri, Adrian)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, #21 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, hereby by GRANTS the stipulation, and ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants deadline to respond to Plaintiffs initial Complaint, by answer, motion, or otherwise, is extended twenty-two (22) days, to and including December 31, 2019; 2. Plaintiffs opposition to any motion to dismiss filed by Defendants shall be filed on or before January 27, 2020; 3. Defendants reply brief in support of a motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before February 10, 2020; and 4. The hearing on any motion to dismiss the Complaint shall be held on February 24, 2020. (es)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 31, 2019 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Michelle)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #19 Non-Resident Attorney Errol J. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Viant, Inc., MultiPlan, Inc., designating Jenifer C. Wallis as local counsel. (es)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Errol J. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Multiplan, Inc., Viant, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24841747) filed by Defendants Multiplan, Inc., Viant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party Multiplan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party Viant, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Wallis, Jenifer)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/21/2020. (lb)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02075 JVS(DFMx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 8:19-cv-02087 JVS(DFMx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (rn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Related Case(s): 19-cv-02075; 19-cv-02082; 19-cv-02083; 19-cv-02084; 19-cv-02085; 19-cv-02086; 19-cv-02087; 19-cv-02088 (Gupta, Divya)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:19-cv-02087 JVS(JDEx). (rn)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Gupta, Divya)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 [APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE filed as] AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Amendment to Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,, #8 Pay.gov ID: 26LBAQTJ fee $400 paid (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gupta, Divya) Modified on 11/13/2019 (es).
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Eisenbrey, Damon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #8 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The document is stricken and counsel shall file an amended or corrected document within 5 business days. (jdo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United HealthCare Services LLC answer now due 12/9/2019; United HealthCare Services, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; United Behavioral Health, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; Optum Services, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; UnitedHealth Group, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; United Healthcare Insurance Company answer now due 12/9/2019; Optum, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; UHC of California answer now due 12/9/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendants United HealthCare Services LLC; United HealthCare Services, Inc.; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; Optuminsight, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Company; Optum, Inc.; UHC of California.(Gupta, Divya)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United Heal #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24732866) filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Inland Detox, Inc.. Related Case(s): 19-cv-02083; 19-cv-02088; 19-cv-02086; 19-cv-02084; 19-cv-02082; 19-cv-02075; 19-cv-02085; 19-cv-0243; 19-cv-0317; 19-cv-0530; 19-cv-0531; 19-cv-0677; 19-cv-0776; 19-cv-0777; 19-cv-1789; 19-cv-0803; 19-cv-0804; 19-cv-1000; 19-cv-1011; 19-cv-1342 (Collins, Richard)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 U:\FS\FSClerkData\CMASSIST\CV Case Opg\CV-11C #1 .pdf) (esa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/1/2019) (esa).
October 31, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Multiplan, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Viant, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Inland Detox, Inc. (filed in state court 9/20/19, submitted as document 1, p. 13) (esa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC,, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company, identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated,; United HealthCare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; UHC of California; UnitedHealthcare Service LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; OptumInsight, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; Optum, Inc.. (Gupta, Divya)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC,, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Gupta, Divya)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01099659 Receipt No: 0973-24708564 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company, OPTUM, INC.,, UHC OF CALIFORNIA,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J Bullock ISO Ntc of Removal) (Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUM, INC.,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UHC OF CALIFORNIA,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Gupta, Divya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inland Detox, Inc. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIPLAN, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC of California
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viant, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiplan, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services LLC
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INLAND DETOX, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Detox, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Susolik
Represented By: Damon D Eisenbrey
Represented By: Adrian L Canzoneri
Represented By: Richard T Collins
Represented By: Daniel J Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?