Southern California Addiction Center, Inc. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADDICTION CENTER INC. and Southern California Addiction Center, Inc.
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC,, UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, VIANT, INC.,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, OPTUM, INC.,, United Healthcare Insurance Company, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, MULTIPLAN, INC.,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UHC of California, Optum, Inc., Viant, Inc., Multiplan, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Does 1 through 25, inclusive and United HealthCare Services, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02088
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #20 . Defendants Viant Inc and MultiPlan, Inc. shall have up to and including 12/31/19 to respond to complaint. (twdb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 31, 2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Southern California Addiction Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Adrian L Canzoneri added to party Southern California Addiction Center, Inc.(pty:pla))(Canzoneri, Adrian)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #18 . Defendants Multiplan, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; Optum Services, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; Optum, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; OptumInSight, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; UHC of California answer due 12/31/2019; United Behavioral Health, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; United HealthCare Services, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; United HealthCare Services, LLC answer due 12/31/2019; United Healthcare Insurance Company answer due 12/31/2019; UnitedHealth Group, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019; Viant, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 31, 2019 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Michelle)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Errol J. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Viant Inc., Multi Plan Inc., Defendants, designating Jenifer C. Wallis as local counsel. (twdb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Errol J. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Multiplan, Inc., Viant, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24842528) filed by Defendants Multiplan, Inc., Viant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party Multiplan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party Viant, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Wallis, Jenifer)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge James V. Selna, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:19-cv-02075 JVS(DFMx) (rn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Related Case(s): 19-cv-02075; 19-cv-02082; 19-cv-02083; 19-cv-02084; 19-cv-02085; 19-cv-02086; 19-cv-02087; 19-cv-02088 (Gupta, Divya)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; OptumInsight, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; and Optum, Inc., designating Divya S. Gupta as local counsel. (twdb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United HealthCare Services, LLC answer now due 12/9/2019; United HealthCare Services, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; United Behavioral Health, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; Optum Services, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; UnitedHealth Group, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; OptumInSight, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; United Healthcare Insurance Company answer now due 12/9/2019; Optum, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019; UHC of California answer now due 12/9/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendants United HealthCare Services, LLC; United HealthCare Services, Inc.; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; OptumInSight, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Company; Optum, Inc.; UHC of California.(Gupta, Divya)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United He #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24732771) filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Southern California Addiction Center, Inc.. Related Case(s): 19-cv-02083; 19-cv-02087; 19-cv-02086; 19-cv-02084; 19-cv-02082; 19-cv-02075; 19-cv-02085; 19-cv-0243; 19-cv-0317; 19-cv-0530; 19-cv-0531; 19-cv-0677; 19-cv-0776; 19-cv-0777; 19-cv-1789; 19-cv-0803; 19-cv-0804; 19-cv-1000; 19-cv-1011; 19-cv-1342 (Collins, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FEDERAL COURT OF HAVING FILED NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Gupta, Divya)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S Grant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
October 31, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Multiplan, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInSight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Viant, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Southern California Addiction Center, Inc. (filed in state court 9/20/19, submitted as document 1, p.24 (esa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company, identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated,; United HealthCare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; UHC of California; UnitedHealthcare Service LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; OptumInsight, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; Optum, Inc.. (Gupta, Divya)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Gupta, Divya)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01099671 Receipt No: 0973-24708668 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC,, United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, Optum Services, Inc., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, United Healthcare Insurance Company, OPTUM, INC.,, UHC OF CALIFORNIA,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J Bullock ISO Ntc of Removal) (Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUM, INC.,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UHC OF CALIFORNIA,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Gupta, Divya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern California Addiction Center, Inc. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIPLAN, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC of California
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viant, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiplan, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Represented By: Errol J King, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInSight, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, LLC
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ADDICTION CENTER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Addiction Center, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Susolik
Represented By: Damon D Eisenbrey
Represented By: Adrian L Canzoneri
Represented By: Richard T Collins
Represented By: Daniel J Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?