In Re Modern VideoFilm, Inc.
Appellee: Modern Videofilm Holdings, LLC, Moshe Barkat and Modern VideoFilm, Inc.
Appellant: Medley Capital Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv02096
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Case No. SA CV 19-1745 and Case No. SA CV 19-2096 are hereby consolidated. The Clerk shall consolidate these actions such that the earlier filed action, Case No. SA CV 19-1745 FMO, is the lead case. All future filings shall be filed in Case No. SA CV 19-1745 FMO until further notice from the court. The Clerk shall administratively close Case No. SA CV 19-2096 FMO. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01745 FMO. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02096 FMO. Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellant Medley Capital Corporation. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01745-FMO (Rawlins, Justin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Appellant Medley Capital Corporation, (Rawlins, Justin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) #5 : Docket Entry # 5; DISCREPANCY was issued in error. Order being appealed is attached. (lom)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (car)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 11/1/2019. (car)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: [judgment, order, or decree not included] Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:18-bk-11792-MW, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Medley Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Modern VideoFilm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Modern Videofilm Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David L Neale
Represented By: Louis R Miller
Represented By: Juliet Y Oh
Represented By: Brian Procel
Represented By: Christopher Dale Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Moshe Barkat
Represented By: David L Neale
Represented By: Louis R Miller
Represented By: Juliet Y Oh
Represented By: Brian Procel
Represented By: Christopher Dale Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Modern VideoFilm, Inc.
Represented By: Sean A O'Keefe
Represented By: Garrick A Hollander
Represented By: Peter William Lianides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Medley Capital Corporation
Represented By: Aaron Gober-Sims
Represented By: Justin E Rawlins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?