Monument Peak Ventures, LLC et al v. Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monument Peak Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02181
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #20 . Defendants shall have up to and including March 9, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (twdb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 9, 2020 filed by Defendants Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm added to party Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm added to party Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm added to party Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm added to party Toshiba Corporation(pty:dft))(Schuettenhelm, Jared)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #17 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Edmonds, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Edmonds, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Edmonds, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Toshiba Corporation. (es)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (es)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. (es)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.. (es)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Additional page)(Edmonds, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC identifying Monument Patent Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Edmonds, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Edmonds, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24761331 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attorney John J Edmonds added to party Monument Peak Ventures, LLC(pty:pla))(Edmonds, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monument Peak Ventures, LLC et al v. Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monument Peak Ventures, LLC
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?