Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Nokia Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Core Optical Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Nokia Corporation, Nokia of America Corp. and Nokia of America Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv02190
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Nokia Corporation served on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Hayes, attorney for Defendants in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hadley, Lawrence)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATIONTO EXTEND TIME TO RESPONDTO INITIAL COMPLAINT ), #15 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Defendants shall file and serve an answer or otherwise respond to the Compliant on or before February 3, 2020. (es)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 3, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Yuri Mikulka added to party Nokia Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Yuri Mikulka added to party Nokia of America Corporation(pty:dft))(Mikulka, Yuri)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Nokia of America Corporation served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hadley, Lawrence)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:12-cv-01872 AG(JPRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02190 AG(JPRx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (rn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88), Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 4. The correct event is Summons Request. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Nokia of America Corporation. (lh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Nokia Corporation. (lh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. Related Case(s): 12-cv-1872; 16-cv-0437; 17-cv-0548 (Hadley, Lawrence)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, (Hadley, Lawrence)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) Modified on 11/13/2019 (lh).
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24765078 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19) (Attorney Lawrence M Hadley added to party Core Optical Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Hadley, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Nokia Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Yuri Mikulka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia of America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By: Yuri Mikulka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core Optical Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence M Hadley
Represented By: Lawrence Robert LaPorte
Represented By: Stephen Eric Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?