EVGA Corporation v. B and H Foto and Electronics Corp et al
Plaintiff: EVGA Corporation
Defendant: B&H Foto & Electronics Corp, DOES 1-10, inclusive and B and H Foto and Electronics Corp
Case Number: 8:2019cv02230
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Review document for details. (tg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp.(Mandell, Joshua)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Kessler on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp (Kessler, Scott)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Scott Kessler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, designating Joshua R Mandell as local counsel. (jp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24843069) filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mandell, Joshua)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to B and H Foto and Electronics Corp answer now due 12/17/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff EVGA Corporation.(Daucher, Brian)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, served on November 20, 2019. (Mandell, Joshua)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
November 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants B and H Foto and Electronics Corp, Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff EVGA Corporation. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp, (Mandell, Joshua)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp. (Mandell, Joshua)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01101394-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24793834 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant B&H Foto & Electronics Corp. (Attorney Joshua Robert Mandell added to party B&H Foto & Electronics Corp(pty:dft))(Mandell, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVGA Corporation v. B and H Foto and Electronics Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVGA Corporation
Represented By: Brian M Daucher
Represented By: Chelsea A Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&H Foto & Electronics Corp
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B and H Foto and Electronics Corp
Represented By: Scott Kessler
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Turner
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?