City of Fullerton et al v. Cephalon Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Fullerton, City of Westminster and The People Of The State Of California
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan, Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., DOES 1 through 100, inclusive, Allergan plc, Mylan Institutional Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo International PLC, SpecGx LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Does 1-100, inclusive and Johnson and Johnson
Case Number: 8:2019cv02235
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #28 Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., and Walgreen Co.'s EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Hearings. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (twdb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING JPML HEARING. The Court hereby STAYS the action and holds all pending motions in abeyance. Defendants are ORDERED to file a status report within 3 days of a decision by the JPML, and in any event, every 4 weeks while the stay is pending. All pending hearing dates are VACATED. (twdb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Reply (Motion related), #32 served on December 30, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #28 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs City of Fullerton, City of Westminster, The People Of The State Of California, of PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CVS PHARMACY, INC. AND WALGREEN CO.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS served on 12/27/2019. (Geibelson, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 30 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CVS PHARMACY, INC. AND WALGREEN CO.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS; DECLARATION OF LUCAS MESSENGER OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #28 filed by Plaintiffs City of Fullerton, City of Westminster, The People Of The State Of California. (Messenger, Lucas)
December 26, 2019 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #28 (electronic service re Judge Carter's procedures regarding Ex Parte Applications) served on December 26, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 26, 2019 Filing 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Spertus, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christa L. Culver Wasserman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Spertus, James)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Conor B. O'Croinin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, designating James W. Spertus as local counsel. (twdb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, #2 Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit No. 4, #6 Exhibit No. 5, #7 Proposed Order) (Spertus, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua David Dick counsel for Defendant Walgreen Co.. Adding Joshua D. Dick as counsel of record for Walgreen Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attorney Joshua David Dick added to party Walgreen Co.(pty:dft))(Dick, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Conor B. O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24999186) filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Spertus, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messenger, Lucas)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs City of Fullerton, City of Westminster, The People Of The State Of California. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand) (Messenger, Lucas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Defendants CVS Health Corporation's and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Spertus, James)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #8 . Defendants Thrifty Payless, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., and Walgreen Co., shall be granted an enlargement of time to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until sixty (60) days after this Court rules on any Motion to Remand, or after the JPML makes a final decision regarding transfer to the MDL Proceeding, whichever is later. (twdb)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #16 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael G Yoder added to party Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Yoder added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Yoder added to party Johnson and Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Yoder added to party Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yoder, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #12 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #11 by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Joseph John Ybarra added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(pty:dft))(Ybarra, Joseph)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Shafroth, Nathan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02154 DOC(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02235 DOC(ADSx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on November 19, 2019. (Spertus, James)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Thrifty Payless Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Benjamin Patrick Smith added to party Thrifty Payless Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Benjamin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Defendants CVS Health Corporation's and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Notice in State Court filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spertus, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on November 15, 2019. (Spertus, James)
November 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs City of Westminster, City of Fullerton, The People Of The State Of California. Filed in State Court on 10/24/19 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., identifying Parent CVS Health Corporation and other potentially interested parties. (Spertus, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01107327 Receipt No: 0973-24795312 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus In Support of Defendants CVS Health Corporation's and CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Related Case, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination, #8 Exhibit G - Docket, #9 Exhibit H - Order Staying Actions Pending JPML Action, #10 Exhibit I - JPML Transfer Order, #11 Exhibit J - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (Attorney James W Spertus added to party CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney James W Spertus added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spertus, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fullerton et al v. Cephalon Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Represented By: Nathan Evans Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G Yoder
Represented By: Amy J Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Joseph John Ybarra, Ybarr
Represented By: Grant B Gelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Charles J Stevens
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: James W Spertus
Represented By: Conor B O'Croinin
Represented By: Christa L Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G Yoder
Represented By: Amy J Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G Yoder
Represented By: Amy J Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: James W Spertus
Represented By: Conor B O'Croinin
Represented By: Christa L Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Michael G Yoder
Represented By: Amy J Laurendeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fullerton
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Melissa Miles Ballard
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Richard D Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Westminster
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Melissa Miles Ballard
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Richard D Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People Of The State Of California
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Melissa Miles Ballard
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Richard D Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?