James Rutherford v. K and K Food, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive, K&K FOOD, INC., a California Corporation, TKPC INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company, K and K Food, Inc. and TKPC Investment, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02251
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING #18 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 4/1/2020. (tg)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION FOR A STAY IN AN ADA CASE AND FOR EARLY MEDIATION filed by Defendants K and K Food, Inc., TKPC Investment, LLC (Rothman, Larry). Modified on 1/17/2020 (jp).
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by DEFENDANT K and K Food, Inc., TKPC Investment, LLC.(Rothman, Larry)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 Declaration PROOF OF SERVICE)(Attorney Larry Rothman added to party K and K Food, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Larry Rothman added to party TKPC Investment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Larry Rothman added to party K and K Food, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Larry Rothman added to party TKPC Investment, LLC(pty:dft))(Rothman, Larry)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant TKPC Investment, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant K and K Food, Inc. served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING STATE-LAW CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim, and the claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (jp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff James Rutherfordto Order to Show Cause, #9 Re: Court's Exercise of Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Babak Hashemi, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff)(Hashemi, Babak)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. Failure to respond may, without further warning, result in dismissal of the entire action without prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants K and K Food, Inc., and TKPC Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 TKPC Investment, LLC) (jtil)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, (Hashemi, Babak)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24807837 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Attorney Babak Hashemi added to party James Rutherford(pty:pla))(Hashemi, Babak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rutherford v. K and K Food, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&K FOOD, INC., a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKPC INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K and K Food, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKPC Investment, LLC
Represented By: Larry Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Represented By: Babak Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?