Kristen Nobles v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Nobles
Defendant: Allergan PLC, Allergan Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02323
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2921 Transfer Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC District of New Jersey at Newark on 1/2/20. (bm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2921, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey at Newark and assigned to Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (rrp)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02064 JLS(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02323 JLS(JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. (ghap)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Kristin Nobles. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02064, 8:19-cv-02101, 8:19-cv-02103, 8:19-cv-02135 (Robinson, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristin Nobles, (Robinson, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kristin Nobles. (Robinson, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kristin Nobles. (Robinson, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24877323 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kristin Nobles. (Attorney Mark P Robinson, Jr added to party Kristin Nobles(pty:pla))(Robinson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristen Nobles v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Nobles
Represented By: Mark P Robinson, Jr
Represented By: Lila Razmara
Represented By: Amanda Deanne McGee
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Jennifer A Lenze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?