Hypertext Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hypertext Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02404
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (rrp)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Josephine L. Staton, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:19-cv-02356 JLS(KESx) (rn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Hypertext Technologies, LLC. (Dickerson, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple Inc. (lh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:19-cv-02404 DOC (KESx). (lh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hypertext Technologies, LLC, identifying Hypertext Technologies, LLC. (Dickerson, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Hypertext Technologies, LLC. (Dickerson, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hypertext Technologies, LLC. (Dickerson, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24943881 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Hypertext Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D) (Attorney Robert W Dickerson, Jr added to party Hypertext Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Dickerson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hypertext Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hypertext Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Murphey
Represented By: Robert W Dickerson, Jr
Represented By: I-Chang John Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?