Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. v. Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Plaintiff: Quest International Monitor Service, Inc.
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc. and DOES 1 through 25
Case Number: 8:2019cv02471
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. (Ghods, Mohammed)
February 14, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Mohammed K. Ghods in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards #9 filed by Plaintiff Quest International Monitor Service, Inc.. (Ghods, Mohammed)
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Lee G. Werner in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards #9 filed by Plaintiff Quest International Monitor Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Ghods, Mohammed)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards #9 filed by Plaintiff Quest International Monitor Service, Inc.. (Ghods, Mohammed)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #14 , #18 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan S Fisher APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., designating Bart L Kessel as local counsel. (jp)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #13 , #17 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J Hill APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., designating Bart L Kessel as local counsel. (jp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan S. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/30/2019, Receipt No. 25033664) filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Iowa Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/30/2019, Receipt No. 25033475) filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Iowa Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25033475) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25033664) #14 (Kessel, Bart)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25033475) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25033664) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: DJ & MJ initials missing. (lt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25033664) filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Iowa - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25033475) filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Iowa - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Illinois - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards #9 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support #10 , Request for Judicial Notice #11 served on 12/27/2019. (Kessel, Bart)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards #9 filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Kessel, Bart)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards #9 (Kessel, Bart)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Quest's Complaint and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
December 20, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Quest International Monitor Service, Inc., attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on December 20, 2019. (Kessel, Bart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on 12/20/2019. (Kessel, Bart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Kessel, Bart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc., (Kessel, Bart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01115181-CU-MC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24995901 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. Hill) (Attorney Bart L Kessel added to party Rockwell Collins, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kessel, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. v. Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Represented By: Bart L Kessel
Represented By: Ryan S Fisher
Represented By: Timothy J Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest International Monitor Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A Rhyne
Represented By: Mohammed K Ghods
Represented By: Lee G Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?