In re Point Center Financial, Inc.
Appellee: Howard B. Grobstein
Debtor: Point Center Financial, Inc.
Appellant: Richard M Kipperman
Case Number: 8:2019cv02505
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 3/6/2020. (jp)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Rodger Martin Landau counsel for Appellee Howard B. Grobstein. Changing firm name to Landau Law LLP. Changing e-mail to rlandau@landaufirm.com. Filed by Appellee Howard B. Grobstein. (Landau, Rodger)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readliness and Completion of Record on Appeal #1 . (jp)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:14-cv-00919-DSF. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-CV-02505-DSF. Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (aco)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellee Howard B. Grobstein. Appellees Notice Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.3 that Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order is Related to Other Bankruptcy Appeals Previously Heard by the Honorable United States District Judge Dale S. Fischer Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-00056-DSF; 8:16-cv-01336-DSF; 8:16-cv-01091-DSF; 8:14-cv-01998-DSF; 8:14-cv-00919-DSF (Zur, Roye)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/27/2019. (car)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Order Reclassifying Claims of Brady Company/San Diego, Inc. [Claim No. 74-1], Brewer Corporation [Claim No. 75-1] Division 8, Inc. [Claim No. 76-1], and Dynaelectric Company [Claim No. 77-1] from Secured Claims to Unsecured Claims entered on 12/17/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Theodor C. Albert, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/27/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:13-bk-11495-TA, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Richard M Kipperman. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Point Center Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Howard B. Grobstein
Represented By: Rodger Martin Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Point Center Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard M Kipperman
Represented By: Jonathan S Dabbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?