Minoru Imai et al v. Diamond Resorts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mari Imai and Minoru Imai
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC and Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00116
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25189653) filed by Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osborn, Blake)
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Epstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25189594) filed by Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osborn, Blake)
January 22, 2020 Filing 21 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A Backman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard W Epstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:19-cv-02000-GPC-AGS, from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 8:20-cv-00116-JLS-KESx. (car)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s) : Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 - VACATED. (no document attached) (ksr) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Southern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Southern Division*. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Order) (dlg) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard W. Esptein, re #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/11/2019.(rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey A. Backman, re #10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/11/2019.(rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Backman, Jeffrey) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Epstein, Richard) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13253957.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Backman, Jeffrey) QC mail sent on 12/10/2019 re missing signature, instructed to re-file but not re-pay (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13253888.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Epstein, Richard) QC mail sent on 12/10/2019 re missing signature, instructed to re-file but not re-pay (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. (Osborn, Blake) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Mari Imai, Minoru Imai. (Sussman, Mitchell) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration : The Court will set a hearing for this motion on January 17, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Any response shall be filed on or before November 22, 2019. Any reply shall be filed on or before December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/19.(dlg) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit)(Osborn, Blake) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC; Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC for Diamond Resorts Corporation; Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Finance Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc. (jmo) (rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, Central District, case number 30-2019-01087447-CU-OR-CJC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13063209.), filed by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #3 Exhibit B - service of process, #4 Exhibit C - notice to state court, #5 Exhibit D - state court documents, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Corrine Gaxiola, Esq. in support)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02000-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jmo) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minoru Imai et al v. Diamond Resorts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Represented By: Blake L Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Represented By: Blake L Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Represented By: Blake L Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari Imai
Represented By: Mitchell Reed Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minoru Imai
Represented By: Mitchell Reed Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?