JD Recovery, LLC v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JD Recovery, LLC
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,, OPTUM, INC.,, Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, VIANT, INC.,, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC, MULTIPLAN, INC.,, United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, UHC of California, Viant, Inc., Multiplan, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00341
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT FOR BAND 2 AND BAND 3 CASES by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case Nos. 8:20-cv-00136; 8:20-cv-00137; 8:20-cv-00138; 8:20-cv-00340; 8:20-cv-00341; and 8:20-cv-00356 should be consolidated under the Lead Case and all attorneys added to the Lead Case docket. Cases associated with Lead Case 8:19-cv-02075 JVS(DFMx) (es)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Multiplan, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., and Viant, Inc. (Attachments: #1 UnitedhealthGrp, #2 UnitedHeathcareSrvcs, #3 UnitedHealthcareInsur, #4 UHCofCalifornia, #5 UHCServicesLLC, #6 UnitedBehavHealthInc, #7 OptumInsight, #8 OptumServicesInc, #9 OptumInc, #10 ViantInc) (jtil)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Requests are blank when opened. Filed documents should be in PDF format when uploaded. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request,, #2 filed by plaintiff JD Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons UnitedHealthcare Service Inc., #2 Summons United HealthCare Insurance Company, #3 Summons UHC of California, #4 Summons United HealthCare Services LLC, #5 Summons United Behavioral Health Inc., #6 Summons OptumInsight, #7 Summons Optum Services Inc., #8 Summons Optum Inc., #9 Summons Viant Inc., #10 Summons MultiPlan, Inc.)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JD Recovery, LLC, (Eisenbrey, Damon)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JD Recovery, LLC. (Eisenbrey, Damon)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JD Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons United HealthCare Ins Co, #2 Summons United HealthCare Services Inc, #3 Summons United Healthcare Services LLC, #4 Summons UnitedHealth Group, Inc., #5 Summons Viant Inc., #6 Summons UHC of CA, #7 Summons Optum Inc., #8 Summons Optum Services Inc., #9 Summons OptumInsight, Inc., #10 Summons MultiPlan, Inc.)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25425602 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff JD Recovery, LLC. (Attorney Damon D Eisenbrey added to party JD Recovery, LLC(pty:pla))(Eisenbrey, Damon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JD Recovery, LLC v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIPLAN, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiplan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Damon D Eisenbrey
Represented By: Edward Susolik
Represented By: Richard T Collins
Represented By: Adrian L Canzoneri
Represented By: Daniel J Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?