Jeffrey I. Barke et al v. Eric Banks et al
Plaintiff: Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough, Rodger Dohm, Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Laura Ferguson and Jim Reardon
Defendant: J. Felix De La Torre, Eric Banks, Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Lou Paulson and Sr. Regional Atty Joseph W. Eckhart
Intervenor Defendant: California Federation of Teachers, SEIU California State Council, California Labor Federation, California School Employees Association and California Teachers Association
Case Number: 8:2020cv00358
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #33 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ramsey)(Ramsey, Jay)
April 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First APPLICATION to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #46 (Eckhart, Joseph)
April 16, 2020 Filing 46 First APPLICATION to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Joseph W. Eckhart. Application set for hearing on 7/10/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Eckhart, Joseph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First REQUEST to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #44 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eckhart, Joseph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 44 First REQUEST to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Joseph W. Eckhart. Request set for hearing on 7/10/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Eckhart, Joseph)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 6/5/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg)
April 14, 2020 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #41 filed by Defendant Joseph W. Eckhart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eckhart, Joseph)
April 14, 2020 Filing 41 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Joseph W. Eckhart. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Eckhart, Joseph)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) CONTINUING HEARING on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #24 ) and (2) DENYING Proposed Intervenors' Ex Parte Application (Doc. #34 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On 3/19/2020, to take effect on March 23, 2020 and to continue to and including 5/1/2020, the Central District of California activated its continuity of Operations Plan (COOP). (See http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/news/covid-19-notice/). Among other measures, in order to slow the spread of the COVID-19 virus, this plan suspends all hearings in civil cases, save for those on emergency matters, which may proceed telephonically only. Accordingly, to facilitate an in-person hearing on Plaintiffs' MPI, the hearing currently set for 5/1/2020 at 10:30 AM., is CONTINUED to 6/19/2020, at 10:30 AM. Additionally, the Court disagrees that it is appropriate for the Unions Motion for Leave to Intervene to be set for hearing on the same date as Plaintiffs' MPI. Instead, the Court sets the Unions' Motion for Leave to Intervene for hearing on 5/8/2020, at 10:30 AM. (jp)
March 25, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Set motion for leave to intervene on May 1, 2020, or the same date as Plaintiffs' Pending Preliminary Injunction Order #34 filed by Intervenor Defendants California Federation of Teachers, California Labor Federation, California School Employees Association, California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle E. Leonard)(Kronland, Scott)
March 25, 2020 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew J Murray counsel for Intervenor Defendants California Federation of Teachers, California Labor Federation, California School Employees Association, California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council. Adding Matthew J. Murray as counsel of record for Proposed Union Intervenor-Defendants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Proposed Union Intervenor Defendants California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council, California Federation of Teachers, California School Employees Association, and California Labor Federation. (Attorney Matthew J Murray added to party California Federation of Teachers(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew J Murray added to party California Labor Federation(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew J Murray added to party California School Employees Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew J Murray added to party California Teachers Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew J Murray added to party SEIU California State Council(pty:intvd))(Murray, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard counsel for Intervenor Defendants California Federation of Teachers, California Labor Federation, California School Employees Association, California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council. Adding Danielle E. Leonard as counsel of record for Proposed Union Intervenor-Defendants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Proposed Intervenor-Defendants California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council, California Federation of Teachers, California School Employees Association, and California Labor Federation. (Attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard added to party California Federation of Teachers(pty:intvd), Attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard added to party California Labor Federation(pty:intvd), Attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard added to party California School Employees Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard added to party California Teachers Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard added to party SEIU California State Council(pty:intvd))(Leonard, Danielle)
March 25, 2020 Filing 36 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Set motion for leave to intervene on May 1, 2020, or the same date as Plaintiffs' Pending Preliminary Injunction Order #34 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ramsey, #2 Exhibit A and B)(Ramsey, Jay)
March 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Proposed Intervenor-Defenda ts California Federation of Teachers, California Labor Federation, California School Employees Association, California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council, identifying None. (Kronland, Scott)
March 24, 2020 Filing 34 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Set motion for leave to intervene on May 1, 2020, or the same date as Plaintiffs' Pending Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Proposed Intervenor-Defendants California Federation of Teachers, California Labor Federation, California School Employees Association, California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kronland, Scott)
March 24, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Proposed Intervenor-Defendants California Teachers Association, SEIU California State Council, California Federation of Teachers, California School Employees Association, California Labor Federation. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement Proposed Answer, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party California Teachers Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party SEIU California State Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party California Federation of Teachers(pty:intvd), Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party California School Employees Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party California Labor Federation(pty:intvd)) (Kronland, Scott)
March 11, 2020 Filing 32 Proof of Service filed by Defendant Joseph W. Eckhart re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #31 (Eckhart, Joseph)
March 11, 2020 Filing 31 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Joseph W. Eckhart answer now due 3/16/2020, filed by defendant Joseph W. Eckhart.(Attorney Joseph William Eckhart added to party Joseph W. Eckhart(pty:dft))(Eckhart, Joseph)
March 2, 2020 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Yarbrough, Laura Ferguson, Rodger Dohm, Ed Sachs, Jeffrey I. Barke, Jim Reardon, Leighton Anderson, upon Defendant J. Felix De La Torre served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Budding, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ramsey, Jay)
March 2, 2020 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Yarbrough, Laura Ferguson, Rodger Dohm, Ed Sachs, Jeffrey I. Barke, Jim Reardon, Leighton Anderson, upon Defendant Lou Paulson served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Budding, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ramsey, Jay)
March 2, 2020 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Yarbrough, Laura Ferguson, Rodger Dohm, Ed Sachs, Jeffrey I. Barke, Jim Reardon, Leighton Anderson, upon Defendant Arthur A. Krantz served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Budding, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ramsey, Jay)
March 2, 2020 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Yarbrough, Laura Ferguson, Rodger Dohm, Ed Sachs, Jeffrey I. Barke, Jim Reardon, Leighton Anderson, upon Defendant Erich Shiners served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Budding, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ramsey, Jay)
March 2, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Yarbrough, Laura Ferguson, Rodger Dohm, Ed Sachs, Jeffrey I. Barke, Jim Reardon, Leighton Anderson, upon Defendant Eric Banks served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Budding, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Michael E Rosman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough, designating David A Schwarz as local counsel. (jp)
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining enforcement of Cal. Gov't Code 3550 . Motion filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
February 25, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Rosman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Re #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Application is incomplete. Proposed Order is blank. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (Thrasher, Lupe)
February 24, 2020 Filing 22 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining enforcement of Cal. Gov't Code 3550 . Motion filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael E. Rosman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25475927) filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael E Rosman for Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Request for summons is addressed to Eric Banks however, request for summons item 4 is addressed to all defendants including Eric Banks. Therefore the Summons has been issued per docket item 4. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Eric Banks, J. Felix De La Torre, Arthur A. Krantz, Lou Paulson, Erich Shiners. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Schwarz, #2 Exhibit A-I)(Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Rodger Dohn in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Phillip Yarbrough in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Leighton Anderson in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jim Reardon in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Laura Ferguson in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Barke in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Ed Sachs in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion #6 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Enforcement of California Government Code Section 3550 . Motion filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. Motion set for hearing on 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Leighton Anderson, Jeffrey I. Barke, Rodger Dohm, Laura Ferguson, Jim Reardon, Ed Sachs, Phillip Yarbrough. (Ramsey, Jay)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25451252 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Phillip Yarbrough, Laura Ferguson, Rodger Dohm, Ed Sachs, Jeffrey I. Barke, Jim Reardon, Leighton Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through H) (Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Leighton Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Jeffrey I. Barke(pty:pla), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Rodger Dohm(pty:pla), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Laura Ferguson(pty:pla), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Jim Reardon(pty:pla), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Ed Sachs(pty:pla), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party Phillip Yarbrough(pty:pla))(Ramsey, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey I. Barke et al v. Eric Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Sachs
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Yarbrough
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodger Dohm
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leighton Anderson
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey I. Barke
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ferguson
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Reardon
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: Mark W Bucher
Represented By: Alexandra Michele Jackson
Represented By: David A Schwarz
Represented By: Michael E Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Felix De La Torre
Represented By: Joseph William Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Banks
Represented By: Joseph William Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Krantz
Represented By: Joseph William Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Shiners
Represented By: Joseph William Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Paulson
Represented By: Joseph William Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sr. Regional Atty Joseph W. Eckhart
Represented By: Joseph William Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: California Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Matthew J Murray
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: SEIU California State Council
Represented By: Matthew J Murray
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: California Labor Federation
Represented By: Matthew J Murray
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: California School Employees Association
Represented By: Matthew J Murray
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: California Teachers Association
Represented By: Matthew J Murray
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?