Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. W Confections, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC and BR IP Holder LLC
Defendant: W Confections, LLC and Uyen T Truong
Case Number: 8:2020cv00384
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Rosen, Jessica)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney David E Worthen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC and BR IP Holder LLC, designating David C Gurnich and Jessica W Rosen as local counsel. (bm)
April 8, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David E. Worthen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26012406) filed by plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rosen, Jessica)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, upon Defendant W Confections, LLC served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uyen Trong, Manager and Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Rosen, Jessica)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, upon Defendant Uyen T Truong served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uyen Trong in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Rosen, Jessica)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING DKT 12 AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez This Matter, having come before the Court on Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for an Order Modifying Dkt 12 and Extending Time to File Pro Hac Vice Application, and GOOD CAUSE appearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application Due, Dkt. 12, is modified. The time to submit the Pro Hac Vice Application (Form G-64) is extended from March 5, 2020 to on or before April 9, 2020. (bm)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining Defendants from continued unauthorized operation of their former Baskin-Robbins shop and from infringing the trademarks and trade dress of Baskin-Robbins . Motion filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Jeffrey L. Karlin, #2 Exhibit 1 to Karlin Certification, #3 Exhibit 2 to Karlin Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Certification of Gary Zullig, #5 Exhibit 1 to Zullig Certification, #6 Exhibit 2 to Zullig Certification, #7 Proposed Order) (Rosen, Jessica)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Form G-64 filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David E. Worthen, #2 Proposed Order) (Rosen, Jessica)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David E Worthen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant W Confections, LLC. (ghap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Uyen T Truong. (ghap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Summons Request, #6 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #5 filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Gurnick, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #5 filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Gurnick, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Gurnick, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC (Gurnick, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Gurnick, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, (Gurnick, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25505037 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Attorney David C Gurnick added to party BR IP Holder LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David C Gurnick added to party Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC(pty:pla))(Gurnick, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. W Confections, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: Jessica Wynette Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: Jessica Wynette Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Confections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uyen T Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?