Robert K Ruegsegger et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ruegsegger, Gigi E Ruegsegger and Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr.
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, DOES 1-20, inclusive, Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 8:2020cv00531
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from June 8, 2020 to July 6, 2020 filed by defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Continuing Hearing Date)(Pollock, Bronwyn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pollock, Bronwyn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Bronwyn F. Pollock, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Proposed Order) (Pollock, Bronwyn)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Cleland B. Welton II APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.; U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for the LSF9 Master Participation Trust; and LSF9 Master Participation Trust, designating Bronwyn F. Pollock as local counsel. (twdb)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Michael H. Bornhorst APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.; U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for the LSF9 Master Participation Trust; and LSF9 Master Participation Trust, designating Bronwyn F. Pollock as local counsel. (twdb)
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds Pltf's Motion to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for MAY 18, 2020, is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on this date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY In Support of motion Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiffs Gigi E Ruegsegger, Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr. (Lake, David)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pollock, Bronwyn)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of MEMORANDUM in Opposition #16 to Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pollock, Bronwyn)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bronwyn F. Pollock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Proposed Order)(Pollock, Bronwyn)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cleland B. Welton II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26152762) filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pollock, Bronwyn)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael H. Bornhorst to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26152555) filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pollock, Bronwyn)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Gigi E Ruegsegger, Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Lake, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiffs Gigi E Ruegsegger, Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr. (Lake, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Gigi E Ruegsegger, Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Lake, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Pollock, Bronwyn)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
March 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr, and Gigi E Ruegsegger in Orange County Superior Court on 3/3/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on 03/16/2020. (Pollock, Bronwyn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-00872; 8:17-cv-00907 (Pollock, Bronwyn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., (Pollock, Bronwyn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Pollock, Bronwyn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01136290-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-25746850 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint with Exhibits A-O, #2 Exhibits P-BB to Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Case Assignment, #6 Notice of Pendency of Action, #7 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt--Civil, #8 Exhibit B - Ex Parte Application for a Termporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #9 Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application, #10 Proof of Service re Ex Parte Application) (Attorney Bronwyn F Pollock added to party Caliber Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bronwyn F Pollock added to party LSF9 Master Participation Trust (pty:dft), Attorney Bronwyn F Pollock added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (pty:dft))(Pollock, Bronwyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert K Ruegsegger et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruegsegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigi E Ruegsegger
Represented By: David N Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K Ruegsegger, Jr.
Represented By: David N Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Bronwyn F Pollock
Represented By: Michael H Bornhorst
Represented By: Cleland B Welton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Bronwyn F Pollock
Represented By: Michael H Bornhorst
Represented By: Cleland B Welton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Bronwyn F Pollock
Represented By: Michael H Bornhorst
Represented By: Cleland B Welton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?