United African Asian Abilities Club et al v. Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV and United African Asian Abilities Club
Defendant: ARBOR LANE PLACENTIA II, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00535
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC answer now due 6/1/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC.(Erlinger, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Michael A. Erlinger of Lead Counsel filed by Defendant Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC. (Erlinger, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Michael A Erlinger counsel for Defendant Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC. Changing email to merlinger@hallgriffin.com. Filed by Defendant Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC. (Erlinger, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS #11 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to May 18, 2020. (iv)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC answer now due 5/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael A Erlinger added to party Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC(pty:dft))(Erlinger, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00535 JFW(ADSx). (rn)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00535-DDP-ADS. (jgu)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC. (car)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying ARBOR LANE PLACENTIA II, LLC. (Wakefield, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25750219 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to the Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United African Asian Abilities Club et al v. Arbor Lane Placentia II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie James Davis IV
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African Asian Abilities Club
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARBOR LANE PLACENTIA II, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Pepek
Represented By: Michael A Erlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?