United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. WPC Development Co. et al
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV and United African-Asian Abilities Club
Defendant: WPC DEVELOPMENT CO., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and WPC Development Co.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00539
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant WPC Development Co..(Singh, Shalend)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant WPC Development Co., identifying Pralle and Case; Whittle Real Estate Trust. (Singh, Shalend)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant WPC Development Co..(Attorney Shalend Shane Singh added to party WPC Development Co.(pty:dft))(Singh, Shalend)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00539-GW-JDE. (jgu)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant WPC Development Co. (lh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying WPC DEVELOPMENT CO., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Wakefield, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25752159 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to the Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. WPC Development Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie James Davis IV
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPC DEVELOPMENT CO., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPC Development Co.
Represented By: Alexander James Harwin
Represented By: Shalend Shane Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?