Linda Pehoviack v. Alex Azar
Plaintiff: Linda Pehoviack
Defendant: Alex Azar
Case Number: 8:2020cv00661
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Linda Pehoviack, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on April 15, 2020. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00661-DOC-KES. (rrp)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alex Azar. (jtil)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Linda Pehoviack, (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Linda Pehoviack. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25969291 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Linda Pehoviack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Farah Tabibkhoei added to party Linda Pehoviack(pty:pla))(Tabibkhoei, Farah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda Pehoviack v. Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Pehoviack
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: James Charles Pistorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?