In Re Yan Sui
Plaintiff: Yan Sui
Defendant: Does 1-10, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., County of Orange, 2176 Pacific Homeowners Assn., David M. Goodrich, Richard A. Marshack, Richard M. Martinez, Marshack Hays LLP, Marshall C. Wallace, Scottsdale Ins. Co, Marissa M. Dennis, John Chase, City of Costa Mesa, Paul M. Krusey, Pickford Escrow, Jennifer Toyama, Jess R. Bressi, Abbey L. Bloestcher, Dentons US LLP, Leck Gamble Mallory and Natsis LLP, Eric F. King, Allen Matkins, Orange Cty Assn of Realtors and Clarence Yoshikane
Case Number: 8:2020cv00864
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (IN CHAMBERS) APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL (DKT. #9 );APPELLEE WELL FARGO BANK, N.A.'S REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PRE-FILING ORDER (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Because Sui failed to comply with the Pre-Filing Order, the Notice of Appeal is STRICKEN, the Motionsto Dismiss are GRANTED, and the appeal is DISMISSED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
June 26, 2020 Filing 33 APPELLANT'S AMENDED AFFIDAVIT to Chief Judge Cormac J. Carney that Hon. Kronstadt Proceeds no Further herein on shown bias and prejudice against Appellant and Favoritism Towards Appellees, Trustee and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Dentons US LLP filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (jp)
June 25, 2020 Filing 32 APPELLANT'S AFFIDAVIT to Chief Judge Cormac J. Carney that Hon. Kronstadt Proceeds no Further herein on shown bias and prejudice against Appellant and Favoritism Towards Appellees, Trustee and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Appellant Yan Sui (jp)
June 24, 2020 Filing 30 APPELLANT'S CONDITIONAL OBJECTION to Transfer of Appeal to Hon. Kronstadt, Combined with a Motion for Reconsideration Based on New Judical Admission that Trustee Sold Non-Bankruptcy Estate, Motion to Transfer Back, Declaration of Yan Sui in support thereof filed by Appellant. Yan Sui. (jp)
June 24, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Reply In Support of Motion To Dismiss Appeal For Failure to Comply with Pre-Filing Order and Opposition to Appellant Yan Sui's Motion to Strike Wells Fargo's Motion To Dismiss filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wallace, Marshall)
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE filed by Defendant/Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Notice of Errata Regarding Erroneous Document Submission (Wallace, Marshall)
June 23, 2020 Filing 26 APPELLANT'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO APPELLANT'S COMBINED MOTION TO STRIKE; YAN SUI'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal #9 filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (bm)
June 23, 2020 Filing 25 (DISREGARD; FILED IN ERROR; SEE DKT. #27 ) REPLY support of a motion to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to Comply with Pre-filing Order and Opposition to Appellant Yan Sui's Motion to Strike Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss filed by Appellee Marshall C. Wallace. (Attorney Marshall C Wallace added to party Marshall C. Wallace(pty:e))(Wallace, Marshall) Modified on 6/26/2020 (cw).
June 22, 2020 Filing 31 APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Related Cases, Request to Transfer to Hon. John A. Kronstadt, and Request for Order Dismissing Appeal for Failure to Comply Pre-Filing Order; Combined With Mtoion to Strike; Yan Sui's Declaration in support #12 filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (jp)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
June 15, 2020 Filing 23 CLERICAL NOTICE by the Clerk: Appellant's Opening Brief in the Appeal #21 was received and scanned on 6/12/20. The file stamp date was misread and docketed as 6/2/20 instead of 6/12/20. The Clerk has replaced the image and corrected the entry to reflect to correct filed date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF in the Appeal filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (jp)
June 12, 2020 Filing 21 APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF IN THE APPEAL filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (bm) (pj). Modified on 6/15/2020 (pj).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:10-cv-01973 JAK (AJW). Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00864-JAK. Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (rrp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal , wit Proof of Service, filed by Appellees Dentons US LLP and Jess R. Bressi, and #9 Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal; and Response to Appellant's Combined Motion to Strike, with Proof of Service, filed by Appellees Dentons US LLP and Jess R. Bressi filed by Appellees Richard A. Marshack, Marshack Hays LLP. (Haes, Chad)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 APPELLANT'S EXCERPT LIST IN THE APPEAL filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7). (jp)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to Appellees' MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal #9 ; Combined with Motion to Strike Pursuant FRCP Rule 12(f); Declaration of Yan Sui filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (jp)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marshall C Wallace counsel for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Adding Marshall C Wallace as counsel of record for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Marshall C Wallace added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:e))(Wallace, Marshall)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marissa M Dennis counsel for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Adding Marissa M Dennis as counsel of record for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Marissa M Dennis added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:e))(Dennis, Marissa)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant/Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Notice (Other) #12 , Miscellaneous Document #13 served on June 4, 2020. (Catapang, Victoria)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Certifcate of Interested Entities or Persons (Catapang, Victoria)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE filed by Defendant/Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Notice of Related Cases, Request to Transfer to Hon. John A. Kronstadt and Request for Order Dismissing Appeal for Failure to Comply with Pre-Filing Order (Catapang, Victoria)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victoria Michelle Catapang counsel for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Adding Michelle F Catapang as counsel of record for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellee/Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Victoria Michelle Catapang added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:e))(Catapang, Victoria)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal , wit Proof of Service, filed by Appellees Dentons US LLP and Jess R. Bressi, and #9 , with Proof of Service filed by Appellees Richard A. Marshack, Marshack Hays LLP. (Haes, Chad)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal , wit Proof of Service, filed by Appellees Dentons US LLP and Jess R. Bressi, and filed by Appellees Richard A. Marshack, Marshack Hays LLP. (Haes, Chad)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 6/25/2020. (jp)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal #1 . (jp)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney D Edward Hays counsel for Appellees Marshack Hays LLP, Richard M. Martinez. Adding D. Edward Hays as counsel of record for Richard A. Marshack and Marshack Hays LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellee Richard A. Marshack and Marshack Hays LLP. (Attorney D Edward Hays added to party Marshack Hays LLP(pty:e), Attorney D Edward Hays added to party Richard M. Martinez(pty:e))(Hays, D)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chad V Haes counsel for Appellees Richard A. Marshack, Marshack Hays LLP. Adding Chad V. Haes as counsel of record for Richard A. Marshack and Marshack Hays LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellee Richard A. Marshack and Marshack Hays LLP. (Attorney Chad V Haes added to party Richard A. Marshack(pty:e), Attorney Chad V Haes added to party Marshack Hays LLP(pty:e))(Haes, Chad)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 5/6/2020. (ghap)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: Notice of Dismissal entered on 4/21/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Catherine E Bauer, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/29/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:11-bk-20448-CB, Adversary number: 8:20-ap-01047-CB, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Yan Sui. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Yan Sui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2176 Pacific Homeowners Assn.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Marshack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshack Hays LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall C. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Ins. Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa M. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Costa Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Krusey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickford Escrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Toyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess R. Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbey L. Bloestcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dentons US LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leck Gamble Mallory and Natsis LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric F. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Matkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Cty Assn of Realtors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Yoshikane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Sui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?