Lawanda M. Carter v. United States
Plaintiff: Lawanda M. Carter
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 8:2020cv00929
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Lawanda M. Carter, re Complaint - (Discovery), Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet #1 served on 7/16/2020. (es)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/24/2020. (lb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned (return to sender unable to forward) addressed to Lawanda M. Carter 21141 Canada Rd Lake Forest, CA 92630 re Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #10 (es)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge James V. Selna, ORDERING Plaintiff proof of service submitted by Plaintiff Lawanda M. Carter received on 5/20/20 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Proof of service premature judicial determination is required. (es)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby GRANTED. (kh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error docket entry No. 4 Proof of Service of Summons was docketed prematurely. The Proofof Service of Summons will be send to the Judge for further review. Re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #4 (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Lawanda M. Carter, upon Defendant United States served on 3/11/2020 by mail, answer due 4/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lawanda M. Carter. (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lawanda M. Carter, (lh)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant United States. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Lawanda M. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawanda M. Carter v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?