W.L.P. Corporation v. Essential Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: W.L.P. Corporation
Defendant: James Thuney and Essential Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01079
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Response to Complaint from July 27, 2020 to August 26, 2020 filed by Defendant James Thuney.(Attorney Andrea Levenson added to party James Thuney(pty:dft))(Levenson, Andrea)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, upon Defendant Essential Services Group, Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Roberts, National Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Von Maack, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, upon Defendant James Thuney served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Thuney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Von Maack, Christopher)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/7/2020. (lb)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Essential Services Group, Inc., James Thuney. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Von Maack, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, (Von Maack, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Von Maack, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26850668 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secured Convertible Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Personal Guaranty, #3 Exhibit Amendment No. 3 to Convertible Promissory Note) (Attorney Christopher Marlowe Von Maack added to party W.L.P. Corporation(pty:pla))(Von Maack, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.L.P. Corporation v. Essential Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.L.P. Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Marlowe Von Maack
Represented By: Brian E Lahti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thuney
Represented By: Andrea Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essential Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?