Dylan Scott Manzanares v. United States of America
Petitioner: Dylan Scott Manzanares
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv01100
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION UNDER 28 USC 2255 by Judge James V. Selna: Counsel for the government shall file their response to the motion not later than September 11, 2020. The petitioner shall file any reply to the government's response not later than October 30, 2020. This matter stands submitted on or upon the filing of the petitioner's reply, whichever comes first. (es)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Robert J. Keenan on behalf of Plaintiff-Respondent United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR terminated. (Attorney Robert J Keenan added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Keenan, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (lh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge James V. Selna. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 8:17-cv-00040-JVS, filed by Petitioner Dylan Scott Manzanares. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dylan Scott Manzanares v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Robert J Keenan
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dylan Scott Manzanares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?