Aspiration Partners, Inc. v. Good Money Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aspiration Partners, Inc.
Defendant: Good Money Group, Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01258
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #12 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Good Money Group, Inc..(Au, Benjamin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samuel Jacob Zeitlin on behalf of Defendant Good Money Group, Inc. (Attorney Samuel Jacob Zeitlin added to party Good Money Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zeitlin, Samuel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Good Money Group, Inc. (Au, Benjamin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #12 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Good Money Group, Inc..(Attorney Benjamin B Au added to party Good Money Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Au, Benjamin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc., upon Defendant Good Money Group, Inc. served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Service of Process Intake Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Camuti, Nathan)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/28/2020. (lb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Aspiration Partners, Inc.. (Camuti, Nathan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 07/15/2020, receipt number 27214309), filed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Camuti, Nathan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Good Money Group, Inc.. (es)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc.. (Camuti, Nathan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc.. (Camuti, Nathan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc.. (Camuti, Nathan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc., (Camuti, Nathan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27214309 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Aspiration Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registration Certificate) (Attorney Nathan Camuti added to party Aspiration Partners, Inc.(pty:pla))(Camuti, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspiration Partners, Inc. v. Good Money Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspiration Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Camuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Money Group, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin B Au
Represented By: Samuel Jacob Zeitlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?