Rachael A Wendel v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rachael A Wendel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2020cv01261
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV20-1261 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/28/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Monge, Troy)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Monge, Troy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel, (Monge, Troy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Monge, Troy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27218445 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rachael A Wendel. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Rachael A Wendel(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachael A Wendel v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael A Wendel
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?