Christopher Patton v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Patton
Defendant: LL Building Products, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and DOES 1 to 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01281
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant LL Building Products, Inc..(Attorney Bradford G Hughes added to party LL Building Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hughes, Bradford)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on July 30, 2020. (Tolson, Zachary)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01281-DOC-KES. (jgu)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01281 JVS (KESx). (eva)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., attached as B. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Christopher Patton in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., identifying Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Tolson, Zachary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01143717-CU-PO-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27254571 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Correspondence) (Attorney Zachary S Tolson added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Tolson, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Patton v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL Building Products, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Baci Hunter
Represented By: Bradford G Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Zachary S Tolson
Represented By: Joshua S Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Patton
Represented By: Darren O Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?