Theresa Reisfelt v. Topco Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Reisfelt
Defendant: TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01283
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Theresa Reisfelt. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Lanza, Anthony)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Reisfelt, identifying Plaintiff THERESA REISFELT; Defendant, TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Lanza, Anthony)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Extend Filing Deadline for Motion to Remand and Further Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #11 . Deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion to Remand 8/28/20; Defendant Response due 10/8/20. (twdb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand; Response to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Topco Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boone, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Topco Associates, LLC answer now due 8/27/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Topco Associates, LLC.(Boone, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Topco Associates, LLC answer now due 8/3/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Topco Associates, LLC.(Boone, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Topco Associates, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on July 22, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ntc to Adverse Party and to Court of Removal to Federal Court)(Boone, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Topco Associates, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 served on July 22, 2020. (Boone, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Topco Associates, LLC., filed by plaintiff Theresa Reisfelt. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/8/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC (Boone, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC, (Boone, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Boone, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01141971-CU-BT-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-27257814 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Declaration Greg Lenski, #3 Exhibit A-C to Greg Lenski Declaration) (Attorney Robert Edward Boone, III added to party TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC(pty:dft))(Boone, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theresa Reisfelt v. Topco Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Reisfelt
Represented By: Robert J Stein, III
Represented By: Ramin Todd Montakab
Represented By: Anthony L Lanza
Represented By: Anthony E Di Vincenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPCO ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Robert Edward Boone, III
Represented By: Kyla Wyatt
Represented By: Simren Kaur Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?