M&M Consulting Group LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: M&M Consulting Group LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and First Republic Bank
Case Number: 8:2020cv01318
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
2 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff M&M Consulting Group LLC. upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jonathan H. Claydon. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants First Republic Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (es)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff M&M Consulting Group LLC. (Singh, Nitoj)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01318 JVS(KESx). (rn)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff M&M Consulting Group LLC, identifying Becca Moody and Todd Major. (Singh, Nitoj)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff M&M Consulting Group LLC. (Singh, Nitoj)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27302611 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff M&M Consulting Group LLC. (Attorney Nitoj P Singh added to party M&M Consulting Group LLC(pty:pla))(Singh, Nitoj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&M Consulting Group LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&M Consulting Group LLC
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Michael E Adler
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?