Xiaohua Huang v. Spectra Equipment Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Spectra Equipment Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01334
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #11 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (es)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (mrgo)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang, upon Defendant Spectra Equipment Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon (signature illegible, no title) in compliance with statute not specified by method of service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), #3 , filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang.(mrgo)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 10/12/2020. (lb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #3 as to Defendant Spectra Equipment Inc. (ghap)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400 into the registry of the Court from Xiaohua Huang. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47) #1 . Receipt number SA016721. (jgu)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Defendant Spectra Equipment Inc. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early.(Filing fee $ 400: PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have submitted a personal check. Please be advised that personal checks are not accepted. Your check will be returned to you by our Fiscal Department. Please send a cashiers check or money order instead. Be sure to reference the civil case number on your payment. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2020: #1 Lodged Complaint, #2 CV-71, #3 Summons) (ghap). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2020: #4 CV-60) (ghap).
July 23, 2020 LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiaohua Huang v. Spectra Equipment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Equipment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?