Allyn Dulabay v. Apex Home Care, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allyn Dulabay
Defendant: Tess Perez, Rose De la Cuesta, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Apex Homecare Services, Inc. and Apex Home Care LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01377
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Apex Home Care, LLC be substituted in place of defendant Apex Homecare Services, Inc. All pleadings in this action only shall be construed nunc pro tunc as pertaining to Apex Home Care, LLC in place of Apex Homecare Services, Inc. The caption in this matter shall be changed to remove Apex Homecare Services, Inc. as a party defendant and to substitute Apex Home Care, LLC; and Apex Homecare Services, Inc. shall be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. #21 (yl)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/16/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Substitute Party filed by Plaintiff Allyn Dulabay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kristensen, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Apex Homecare Services, Inc., Rose De la Cuesta, Tess Perez (Yun, Ji)
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Apex Homecare Services, Inc., Rose De la Cuesta, Tess Perez, identifying Plaintiff Alan Dulabay; Apex Home Care LLC; Tess Perez; Rose de la Cuesta. (Yun, Ji)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Apex Homecare Services, Inc., Rose De la Cuesta, Tess Perez.(Attorney Ji Hee Yun added to party Rose De la Cuesta(pty:dft))(Yun, Ji)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Allyn Dulabay, upon Defendant Tess Perez served on 8/4/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer Ammarillo, Business Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Martinez, Jesenia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Allyn Dulabay, upon Defendant Rose De la Cuesta served on 8/4/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer Ammarillo, Business Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Martinez, Jesenia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Allyn Dulabay, upon Defendant Apex Homecare Services, Inc. served on 8/6/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gaile Doe, Coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Martinez, Jesenia)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tess Perez answer now due 9/9/2020; Apex Homecare Services, Inc. answer now due 9/9/2020; Rose De la Cuesta answer now due 9/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Tess Perez; Apex Homecare Services, Inc..(Attorney Ji Hee Yun added to party Apex Homecare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ji Hee Yun added to party Tess Perez(pty:dft))(Yun, Ji)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01377 SVW (KESx). (eva)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apex Homecare Services, Inc. (car)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tess Perez. (car)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rose De la Cuesta. (car)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Allyn Dulabay. (Kristensen, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Allyn Dulabay. (Kristensen, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Allyn Dulabay. (Kristensen, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allyn Dulabay, (Kristensen, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allyn Dulabay. (Kristensen, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27392475 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Allyn Dulabay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party Allyn Dulabay(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allyn Dulabay v. Apex Home Care, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tess Perez
Represented By: Elizabeth H Murphy
Represented By: Ji Hee Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose De la Cuesta
Represented By: Ji Hee Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Homecare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth H Murphy
Represented By: Ji Hee Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Home Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyn Dulabay
Represented By: Jesenia Anahy Martinez
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Ventura
Represented By: John P. Kristensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?