Just Wheels and Tires Co. v. TXW Wheels, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Just Wheels and Tires Co, and Just Wheels and Tires Co.
Defendant: TXW Wheels, Inc. and Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01524
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-131) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01524 SB-ADSx. (rrp)
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for October 5, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Evan D. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Just Wheels and Tires Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28088594) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Suspended in Colorado for non payment of Inactive fee. (Thrasher, Lupe)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Evan D. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Just Wheels and Tires Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28088594) filed by Plaintiff Just Wheels and Tires Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zfaty, Isaac)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) (First Amended Answer) filed by Defendant TXW Wheels, Inc..(Bacani, Lena)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isaac Raymond Zfaty on behalf of Plaintiff Just Wheels and Tires Co. (Zfaty, Isaac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isaac Raymond Zfaty on behalf of Plaintiff Just Wheels and Tires Co. (Attorney Isaac Raymond Zfaty added to party Just Wheels and Tires Co.(pty:pla))(Zfaty, Isaac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by TXW Wheels, Inc.. (Bacani, Lena)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant TXW Wheels, Inc..(Bacani, Lena)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 20, inclusive, TXW Wheels, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Just Wheels and Tires Co. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TXW Wheels, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 08/18/2020. (Bacani, Lena)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosures and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TXW Wheels, Inc., identifying Just Wheels & Tires Co. (Pl), TXW Wheels, Inc. (Def), no corporate parent or publicly traded shareholders. (Bacani, Lena)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by TXW Wheels, Inc.. (Bacani, Lena)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TXW Wheels, Inc.. (Bacani, Lena)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: ACACDC-27675665 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant TXW Wheels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Attorney Lena Nadine Bacani added to party TXW Wheels, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bacani, Lena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Just Wheels and Tires Co. v. TXW Wheels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Wheels and Tires Co,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Wheels and Tires Co.
Represented By: Sam Maralan
Represented By: Evan D. Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey J Astarabadi
Represented By: Isaac Raymond Zfaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXW Wheels, Inc.
Represented By: Lena Nadine Bacani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?