Roy Davis Gash v. Cadigan Santa Clara, LP, et al
Plaintiff: Roy Davis Gash
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, CADIGAN SANTA CLARA, LP and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01527
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINALSETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROMACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OFDISMISSAL #11 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than November 15, 2020. If no dismissal is filed, the Court deems the matter dismissed at that time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement OF THE CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than October 20, 2020, why th is action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). See minute order for further details. (lom)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File 10/14/2020 filed by Defendant Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Craig D McMahon added to party Cadigan Santa Clara, LP(pty:dft))(McMahon, Craig)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash, identifying CADIGAN SANTA CLARA, LP. (Wakefield, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27680064 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Roy Davis Gash(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy Davis Gash v. Cadigan Santa Clara, LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Davis Gash
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CADIGAN SANTA CLARA, LP
Represented By: Craig D McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?