United States of America v. Nohad Mousa
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nohad Mousa
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 8:2020cv01528
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re Stipulation and Order,, Terminated Case, #12 served on 10/1/2020. (Mockler, Brendan)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT #11 by Judge James V. Selna. It is hereby ORDERED that Tuttle-Click, Inc. and Tuttle Click Tustin, Inc. (Garnishee) shall pay the United States, on a continuing basis, a monthly amount equal to 15% of Defendant's monthly disposable earnings. It is further ORDERED that the writ issued on August 28, 2020 as to JP Morgan Chase Bank is hereby released in its entirety. See order for further information. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Order for Entry of Final Order of Garnishment filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mockler, Brendan)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01528-JVS. (rrp)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re Order, #4 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 served on 9/23/2020. (Mockler, Brendan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by garnishee JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(twdb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Order, #4 , Writ of Garnishment #6 served on 9/1/2020. (Mockler, Brendan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. (twdb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S 28 U.S.C. 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR. (twdb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(1)] AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (twdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 8:20-cv-01528 CJC. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (esa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Mockler, Brendan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE JP MORGAN CHASE BANK No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #2 Clerk's Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Brendan T Mockler added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Mockler, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nohad Mousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nohad Mousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brendan T Mockler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?