Lisa Lynn Wolfs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lisa Lynn Wolfs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2020cv01534
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV20-1534 AS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Lynn Wolfs, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 8/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Lisa Lynn Wolfs. (Monge, Troy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Lynn Wolfs. (Monge, Troy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Lynn Wolfs, (Monge, Troy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Lynn Wolfs. (Monge, Troy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27695038 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Lynn Wolfs. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Lisa Lynn Wolfs(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Lynn Wolfs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lynn Wolfs
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?